Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0762790
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.09.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
19.09.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
13.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.12.2002 |
First examination report |
|
19.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.01.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
08.10.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
31.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
27.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
27.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|