Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0765778
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
20.07.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
04.08.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
04.08.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
11.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.12.1999 |
First examination report |
|
29.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.06.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
03.04.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |
03.04.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |
14.02.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] |
11.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
11.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|