EP0765778 - Seat cover for protecting motor car seats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horn & Bauer GmbH & Co. KG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 105 34613 Schwalmstadt / DE | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Stephanie Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 105 34613 Schwalmstadt / DE | [2000/38] |
Former [1997/14] | 01 /
Horn-Paul, Stephanie Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 105 34613 Schwalmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1997/14] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112580.4 | 03.08.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | DE1995136062 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19536062 | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0765778 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0765778 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765778 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, A47C31/10 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
B60N2/6063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/14] | B60N2/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | Sitzbezug zum Schutz eines Kraftfahrzeug-Sitzes | [1997/14] | English: | Seat cover for protecting motor car seats | [1997/14] | French: | Revêtement de sièges pour la protection de sièges de véhicules automobiles | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3695692 (WILLIAMS ROBERT J); | [A]DE3419728 (PE PACK KUNSTSTOFF GMBH [DE]); | [AD]US4676376 (KEISWETTER PAUL C [US]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4884839 (KEISWETTER PAUL C [US]); | [A]DE4132714 (HORN-PLASTIK) [A] 1 * page 1, line 22 - page 8, line 28; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE4210232 (HORN & BAUER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * Querschweißung 29;; figures 9,15 *; | [A]DE4333051 (HORN & BAUER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 65 - page 8, line 36; figures 5-7 * |