EP0762213 - Process for preparing a photopolymerizable printing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miele, Emil Frederick Six Roosevelt Terrace Howell, New Jersey 07731 / US | 02 /
Hutnich, Robert S. 22 Longfellow Terrace Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1997/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112630.7 | 05.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | US19950519377 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: US 519377 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762213 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762213 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762213 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/16 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G03F7/16 (EP,US);
Y10S430/136 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1741 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1997/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer photopolymerisierbaren Druckform | [1997/11] | English: | Process for preparing a photopolymerizable printing element | [1997/11] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer une plaque d'impression photopolymérisable | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3837887 (AKAMATSU K, et al); | [X]US4087182 (AIBA HIROAKI, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,6 * * column 11, line 17 - line 52 *; | [A]EP0185337 (DU PONT [US]) |