EP0824022 - Parenteral drug administration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microflow Engineering SA Jaquet-Droz, 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states Microflow Engineering SA Rue Jaquet-Droz, 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Joseph Vignes Perdues 17 2022 Bevaix / CH | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/08] | Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 96112925.1 | 12.08.1996 | [1998/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824022 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
A61M5/1408 (EP);
A61M5/16827 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/44] |
Former [1998/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Parenterales Arzneiverabreichungssystem | [1998/08] | English: | Parenteral drug administration system | [1998/08] | French: | Système d'administration parentérale de médicaments | [1998/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/22] | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [1999/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]USRE33021E (HAL C. DANBY) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 55 * [Y] 2-13; | [Y]EP0642802 (DISETRONIC AG) [Y] 2-5,8,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 17 *; | [Y]WO9526236 (ZENECA LTD) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 28 *; | [YA]WO9501137 (VOGES INNOVATION PTY LTD ;VOGES ROBERT MARTIN (AU)) [Y] 10-12 * abstract * * page 14, line 7 - page 18, line 17 * * page 21, line 5 - line 13 * * page 21, line 20 - line 22 * * page 29, line 2 - line 10 * [A] 8; | [Y]WO9215353 (MIRIS MEDICAL CORP) [Y] 13 * abstract *; | [A]US4583975 (PEKKARINEN MICHAEL O ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A]WO9325258 (NORTON HEALTHCARE LTD ;LANGFORD ALAN KEITH (GB); RIDGWAY KENNETH () [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]US4109863 (OLSON KENNETH W ET AL) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6456038 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890609), vol. 013, no. 249, Database accession no. (C - 605), & JP01056038 A 19890302 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST LTD) [A] 7 * abstract * |