Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2547310B | Global Dossier | 23.10.1996 | B2 | JPH07508664 | 28.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0733445 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2002 | B2 | EP0733445 | 11.03.1998 | B1 | EP0733445 | 22.01.1997 | A3 | EP0733445 | 25.09.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | EP93901709 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | EP95109208 | 18.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0691187 | Global Dossier | 27.08.1997 | B1 | EP0691187 | 10.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | EP95109208 | 18.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0678362 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2001 | B2 | EP0678362 | 11.02.1998 | B1 | EP0678362 | 17.01.1996 | A3 | EP0678362 | 25.10.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | EP93901709 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0618853 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2002 | B2 | EP0618853 | 13.03.1996 | B1 | EP0618853 | 12.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0745461 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2000 | B1 | EP0745461 | 22.01.1997 | A3 | EP0745461 | 04.12.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | EP93901709 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | EP95109208 | 18.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69209091T | 19.12.2002 | T3 | DE69209091T | 05.09.1996 | T2 | DE69209091D1 | 18.04.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0618853T | 04.11.2002 | T4 | DK0618853T | 01.04.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2114249T | 16.12.2001 | T5 | ES2114249T | 16.05.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | EP93901709 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9127092D0 | 19.02.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9127102D0 | 19.02.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK42197 | 11.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5611145 | 18.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6098289 | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9202960 | 18.12.1992 | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9312916 | Global Dossier | 05.08.1993 | A3 | WO9312916 | 08.07.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09206482 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2798210B | Global Dossier | 17.09.1998 | B2 | JPH09131475 | 20.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2758880B | Global Dossier | 28.05.1998 | B2 | JPH0919574 | 21.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2661895B | Global Dossier | 08.10.1997 | B2 | JPH08336682 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2613759B | Global Dossier | 28.05.1997 | B2 | JPH08336681 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE135277T | 15.03.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE157297T | 15.09.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE163148T | 15.02.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE163877T | 15.03.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE197261T | 15.11.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69221907T | 29.01.1998 | T2 | DE69221907D1 | 02.10.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69224440T | 06.06.2002 | T3 | DE69224440T | 02.07.1998 | T2 | DE69224440D1 | 19.03.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69224761T | 05.12.2002 | T3 | DE69224761T | 06.08.1998 | T2 | DE69224761D1 | 16.04.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69231548T | 07.06.2001 | T2 | DE69231548D1 | 07.12.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0745461T | 05.03.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2088267T | 16.03.2003 | T5 | ES2088267T | 01.08.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1002629 | 04.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6052904 | 25.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9127102 | 20.12.1991 | GB9127092 | 20.12.1991 | Type | Earlier application | EP0618853 | EP0678362 |