EP0745461 - Dry-shaving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2000/13] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzel, Matthias Samlandweg 12 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 02 /
Royle, Terence Gordon 21 Foxcote Wokingham, Berkshire PG11 3PG / GB | 03 /
Parsonage, Raymond Graham 40 Highway Road Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 5AE / GB | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/18] |
Former [1996/49] | Avery, Stephen John Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112945.9 | 18.12.1992 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | GB19910027102 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9127102 | GB19910027092 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9127092 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0745461 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0745461 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745461 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/04 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B26B19/048 (EP,US);
B26B19/044 (EP,US);
B26B19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Trockenrasiergerät | [1996/49] | English: | Dry-shaving apparatus | [1996/49] | French: | Rasoir à sec | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 29.01.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93901709.1 / EP0618853 | EP95109208.9 / EP0678362 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2574317 (BERG EMIL G) [A] 1-7* column W *; | [DXA]GB2036631 (GILLETTE CO) [DX] 17,18 * the whole document * [A] 1,10,11,16; | [XA]EP0077093 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 17 * page 3, line 12 - line 26 * * page 15, line 30 - page 19, line 4; figures 3,4 * [A] 1-5,9-16,18; | [DXA]DE3926894 (BRAUN AG) [DX] 17 * the whole document * [A] 1,7,9,10,12,14-16 |