EP0765743 - Readily soluble laminated film and preparation process therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/14] | Dimensionally stable, non-oriented laminated film and preparation process therefor | ||
[2001/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RMH Polymers GmbH & Co. KG Hallesche Strasse 27 06258 Schkopau / DE | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauk, Jürgen, Dr. Prälat-Michael-Höck-Strasse 53 85354 Freising / DE | 02 /
Hardeweg, Heike Letterhausstrasse 25 46342 Velen / DE | 03 /
Hüfftlein, Karlheinz Othellostrasse 15 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Schumacher, Rainer, Dr. Pfarranger 5 38299 Salzgitter-Barum / DE | [2003/14] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
Hauk, Jürgen, Dr. Prälat-Michael-Höck-Strasse 53 85354 Freising / DE | ||
02 /
Hardeweg, Heike Letterhausstrasse 25 46342 Velen / DE | |||
03 /
Hüfftlein, Karlheinz Othellostrasse 15 70563 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
Schumacher, Rainer, Dr. Knappendorfer Weg 57 06217 Merseburg / DE | |||
Former [1997/14] | 01 /
Hauk, Jürgen, Dr. Röderberg 11 06114 Halle / DE | ||
02 /
Hardeweg, Heike Rosenstrasse 1 06114 Halle / DE | |||
03 /
Hüfftlein, Karlheinz Othellostrasse 15 70563 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
Schumacher, Rainer, Dr. Knappendorfer Weg 57 06217 Merseburg / DE | Representative(s) | Pauling, Hans-Jürgen Am Treff 1 06124 Halle / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2004/04] | Pauling, Hans-Jürgen Patentanwaltskanzlei im ChemiePark Bitterfeld/Wolfen Puschkinplatz 2a 06766 Wolfen / DE | ||
Former [1997/14] | Pauling, Hans-Jürgen August-Bebel-Platz 8 06108 Halle / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112992.1 | 13.08.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | DE1995136048 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19536048 | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0765743 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0765743 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765743 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09D133/04, C09J133/04, B32B31/12 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B32B38/10 (EP);
B32B37/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/14] | B32B31/12, // C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | Leicht auflösbare Verbundfolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/45] | English: | Readily soluble laminated film and preparation process therefor | [2001/45] | French: | Film laminé facilement soluble, et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/45] |
Former [1997/14] | Formbeständige, orientierungsfreie Verbundfolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1997/14] | Dimensionally stable, non-oriented laminated film and preparation process therefor | ||
Former [1997/14] | Film laminé non orienté, dimensionnellement stable, et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 30.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.1999 | 31.08.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.05.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.08.2003 | |
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3575910 (THOMAS ROBERT N) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]EP0143935 (BELLAND AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 9,11 *; | [A]DE8702864U (HANS NESCHEN GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2; claims 1,5,6,9 *; | [DA]EP0316676 (BELLAND AG [CH]) [DA] 1,2 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 16; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE3809335 (GOETTEL HEINZ KOMET DRUCK [DE]) [A] 2 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0350240 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 47 - line 57 *; | [A]US4937282 (PFOEHLER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - line 16; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0619352 (DECORA INC [US]) [A] 2* page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 26; figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0696610 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK [JP]) [PA] 1,2 * page 16, line 43 - page 17, line 51 * |