EP0745415 - Sludge filtering and thickening installation and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210 / JP | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Mikimasa, Nagasaka Dormitory 3-9-7 Nagasaka Yokosuka City, Kanagawa 240-01 / JP | 02 /
Fukuzawa, Hiroshi 1083 Shinohara-cho, Minatokita-ku Yokohama City, Kanagawa 222 / JP | 03 /
Arai, Toshitaka 8-2-6-104 Kamagaya Kamagaya City, Chiba 273-01 / JP | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al G.F. Redfern & Co., 7 Staple Inn, Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1996/49] | Topley, Paul, et al G.F. Redfern & Co. Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96113134.9 | 05.01.1994 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930000867 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: JP 86793 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0745415 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0745415 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745415 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/39, B01D29/66, B01D29/82 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B01D29/33 (EP,US);
C02F11/121 (KR);
B01D29/25 (KR);
B01D29/39 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP,US);
B01D29/66 (EP,US);
B01D29/822 (EP,US);
B01D29/90 (KR);
B01D29/92 (EP,KR,US);
C02F11/12 (KR);
B01D2201/0484 (EP,US);
B01D2201/206 (EP,US);
Y02W10/20 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/49] | Title | German: | Anlage und Verfahren zum Filtern und Eindicken von Schlämmen | [1996/49] | English: | Sludge filtering and thickening installation and method | [1996/49] | French: | Procédé et installation de filtration et d'épaississement de boues | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94300040.6 / EP0606154 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB123589 (BRITISH DYES LTD, et al) [Y] 3* page 3, line 8 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4064045 (SCHMIDT JR HENRY) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 3 |