EP0766483 - Grounding clamp for use in a connection device for telecommunication and data techniques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 D-14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferenc, Nad, Dipl.-Ing. Heiligendammer Strasse 6 14199 Berlin / DE | [1997/14] | Application number, filing date | 96113454.1 | 22.08.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | DE1995215982U | 29.09.1995 Original published format: DE 29515982 U | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766483 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14, H01R9/00 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
H02B1/052 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R9/2691 (EP,US);
H02B1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/14] | Extension states | LT | 31.08.1996 | LV | 31.08.1996 | SI | 31.08.1996 | Title | German: | Erdungsbügel, insbesondere zur Verwendung in einer Anschlusseinrichtung für die Fernmelde- und Datentechnik | [1997/14] | English: | Grounding clamp for use in a connection device for telecommunication and data techniques | [1997/14] | French: | Etrier de mise à la masse pour utilisation dans un dispositif de raccordement pour la technique de télécommunication et de données | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/52] | 17.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |