Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0761147 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2001 | B1 | EP0761147 | 12.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT143395 | 25.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT403119B | 25.11.1997 | B | ATA143395 | 15.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | AT143395 | 25.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59606938D1 | 28.06.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT143395 | 25.08.1995 |