EP0760470 - Manometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mock, Bruno Armin Buolterlistrasse 63 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 96113644.7 | 26.08.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | CH19950002454 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: CH 245495 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0760470 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0760470 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/14, G01L19/16, G01D7/08, G01K1/04 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
G01L19/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/10] | G01L19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/10] | Title | German: | Manometer | [1997/10] | English: | Manometer | [1997/10] | French: | Manomètre | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0369570 (INTEL GASGARDS PRIVATE LTD [IN]) [A] 1* column 5 - column 22 *; | [AP]US5471881 (HOCHSTEIN KIM W [US]) [AP] 1 * column 1 *; | [E]FR2739184 (DELSECCO CLAUDE [FR]) [E] 1-3 * page 2 * |