EP0764906 - Method of operating a real time computer system controlled by a real time operating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blank, Felix, Dipl.inf. Bäckerbauerstr. 2 81241 München / DE | 02 /
Wiesinger, Ursula, Dipl.Inf. Aidenbachstr. 138 A 81479 München / DE | 03 /
Schicklinski, Peter, Dipl.Math. Lochhamerstr. 79 81477 München / DE | 04 /
Sterr, Bettina Fürstenriederstr. 215 81377 München / DE | [1997/13] | Application number, filing date | 96113853.4 | 29.08.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | DE1995135546 | 25.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19535546 | [1997/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764906 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764906 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764906 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/24, G06F9/46 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G06F9/4812 (EP,US);
G06F13/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | G06F13/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines durch ein Realzeit-Betriebssystem gesteuerten Realzeit-Computersystems | [1997/13] | English: | Method of operating a real time computer system controlled by a real time operating system | [1997/13] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un système d'ordinateur en temps réel commandé par un système d'exploitation en temps réel | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05313916 ; | [A]JPH02138632 ; | [A]US4517643 (BANNAI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 29 - line 48 *; | [A]US5161226 (WAINER SUSAN E [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 6 *; | [A]EP0594377 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 44 - line 52 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940303), vol. 018, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 1703), & JP05313916 A 19931126 (FUJITSU LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900810), vol. 014, no. 372, Database accession no. (P - 1091), & JP02138632 A 19900528 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - "TECHNIQUE TO IMPROVE CONTEXT SWITCHING PERFORMANCE IN A CPU", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19900801), vol. 33, no. 3B, page 472/473, XP000124425 [A] 1-14 * column W * |