EP0761673 - Cephalosporin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hebeisen, Paul 102 Rennweg 4052 Basle / CH | 02 /
Stalder, Henri 145 St. Johanns-Ring 4056 Basle / CH | 03 /
Heinze-Krauss, Ingrid 6 Hermann-Burte-Strasse 79418 Schliengen / DE | 04 /
Weiss, Urs 20A Wyhlenstrasse 4133 Pratteln / CH | 05 /
Richter, Hans 29 Kirchstrasse 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 06 /
Yiannikouros, George Petros 21 Varady Drive Fords, New Jersey 08863 / US | 07 /
Runtz, Valeri 12a, rue des sangliers 68170 Rixheim / FR | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Kjellsaa-Berger, Hanny, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Kjellsaa-Berger, Hanny, Dr., et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 96113998.7 | 02.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | EP19950114303 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: EP 95114303 | EP19950114304 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: EP 95114304 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761673 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/48, A61K31/545 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
C07D501/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Cephalosporin-Derivate | [1997/11] | English: | Cephalosporin derivatives | [1997/11] | French: | Dérivés de céphalosporine | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0620225 (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG) [X] 1,19-23,25 * pages 5, 7, 20, 21, 52, 62, 63, 67-69, 76, 81, 96, 137-139 *;; claims 1,33,36-40,43 *; | [A]EP0359536 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC) [A] 1,19-22 * claims 1,6,7,10,12,13 *; | [A]US4255423 (T.R. BEATTIE ET AL.) [A] 1,22 * column 21, example 17 * | [PX] - I. HEINZE-KRAUSS ET AL., "Synthesis and Structure-Activity Relationship of (Lactamylvinyl)cephalosporins Exhibiting Activity against Staphylococci, Pneumococci, and Enterococci", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 1864 - 71, XP000576779 [PX] 1,22 * page 1868, table 4, compounds 10j, 10k, 10l, 10m, 10n * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950886v |