EP0761414 - Fluid dispenser and method of making such dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. Erich Pfeiffer GmbH Öschlestrasse 124-126 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Karl-Heinz Am Graben 67 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
Ritsche, Stefan Arsenius-Pfaff-Strasse 1 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114040.7 | 03.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE1995133052 | 07.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19533052 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761414 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761414 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/08, B65D83/76 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B29C53/083 (EP,US);
B05B11/0005 (EP,US);
B05B15/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Austragvorrichtung für Medien sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Austragvorrichtung | [1997/11] | English: | Fluid dispenser and method of making such dispenser | [1997/11] | French: | Distributeur de fluide et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1196323 (GUILLOT) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3974252 (BISCHOFF JR ROBERT F) [A] 1,2,8-10 * column 1, line 12 - line 28 * * column 2, line 9 - line 21 * * claim 2 *; | [A]US4220285 (GUALDI PIERO [IT]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3942308 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 38 - line 55 * * figure - *; | [A]US5062549 (SMITH DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,9* figure 2 *; | [A] - L.A. GOETTLER, A.J. LAMBRIGHT, R.I. LEIB AND P.J. DI MAURO, "EXTRUSION-SHAPING OF CURVED HOSE REINFORCED WITH SHORT CELLULOSE FIBERS", RUBBER CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, (1981), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 277 - 300, XP002046688 [A] 4 * page 277 - page 278 * |