EP0763878 - Off-line phase control low-power power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St. Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helfrich, Kenneth Jay 7674 Madden Place Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Ahrens, Thomas Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Ahrens, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114117.3 | 04.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | US19950529481 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: US 529481 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0763878 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0763878 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/156 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
H02M7/2176 (EP);
H04N5/63 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/12] | H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Stromversorgung mit niedriger Leistung zur Off-Line-Phasensteuerung | [1997/12] | English: | Off-line phase control low-power power supply | [1997/12] | French: | Alimentation à faible énergie pour la commande à phase hors-ligne | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3727117 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,10-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0651499 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 8,10 *; | [X]US4685046 (SANDERS GARY G [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * |