EP0763750 - Radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Yosuke, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Suganuma, Seishi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114236.1 | 05.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | JP19950238443 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23844395 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763750 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763750 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/41 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
G01S7/412 (EP,US);
G01S13/723 (EP,US);
G01S13/89 (EP,US);
G01S7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/12] | Title | German: | Radarsysteme. | [1997/12] | English: | Radar system | [1997/12] | French: | System de radar. | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5392050 (GUERCI JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, line 52 - line 65 *; | [A]GB2229027 (GEC AVIONICS [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4527161 (WEHNER DONALD R [US]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]WO8700930 (NORGES TEKNISK NATURVITENSKAPE [NO]) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH06174838 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940926), vol. 18, no. 510, Database accession no. (P - 1804), & JP06174838 A 19940624 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [DA] * abstract * |