EP0761110 - Sample garment making system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland Connecticut 06084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | ||
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Gerber Garment Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LeBlond, Claude 117 Reservoir Avenue Broad Brook, CT 06016 / US | 02 /
Williams, Kevin M. 9 Pheasant Run Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | 03 /
Zusmanovich, Alex 100 Skyline Drive South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | 04 /
Buckle, Allan 3 Holly Court Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | 05 /
Stein, Darryl Colburn 530 Lake Road Andover, CT 06232 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114319.5 | 06.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | US19950525123 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: US 525123 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761110 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761110 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761110 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A41H3/00, B26D7/01, B26F1/38, B26D1/157, G06F3/033 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B26F1/3813 (EP,US);
B26D1/157 (EP,US);
B26D7/018 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6579 (EP,US);
Y10T83/748 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Musterproben | [1997/11] | English: | Sample garment making system | [1997/11] | French: | Dispositif pour la création de modèles | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 06.09.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2046339 (MUTO INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD) [X] 1-3 * figure - *; | [X]DE2065230 (GERBER GARMENT TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO8704657 (CREST FOAM CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XA]GB2188170 (GERBER GARMENT TECHNOLOGY INC) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 68 - line 90 * [A] 4; | [X]FR2669580 (MUTOH IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A] - GUICHARD, "de la création au placement", FILIERE MAILLE, PARIS FR, (199412), no. 30, pages 64 - 67, XP000477805 |