EP0761606 - Small clarification plant with a compact construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÖKOSERVICE GESELLSCHAFT FÜR UMWELTANALYTIK UND KLÄRANLAGENBETREUUNG GMBH Heerweg 15 A 73770 Denkendorf / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zink, Jürgen Im Asenwald 58 70599 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Fass, Gerhard Patent u. Zivilingenieur Achalmstrasse 25 73770 Denkendorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114491.2 | 10.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE1995133737 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19533737 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761606 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761606 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/20 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
C02F3/1247 (EP);
C02F3/1242 (EP);
Y02A20/208 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1997/11] | Title | German: | Kleinkläranlage in kompakter Bauweise | [1997/11] | English: | Small clarification plant with a compact construction | [1997/11] | French: | Petite installation de clarification de construction compacte | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/40] | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.12.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2136871 (BOEHNKE BOTHO) [Y] 1,3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 * * page 11, lines 6-12 * [A] 4,5,10,11; | [Y]US3713543 (HEANEY D) [Y] 1,3 * column 3, lines 38-42; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1037843 (SCHREIBER AUGUST) [A] 1,3,6 * page 3, lines 14-25 *; | [A]WO9203386 (BIOSCAN AS [NO]) [A] 1,3 * Zusammmenfassung *;; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS6331597 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880708), vol. 012, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 510), & JP63031597 A 19880210 (TOKYO KOKI SEISAKUSHO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 2,12 * abstract * |