EP0751353 - Filter screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTOTECH INC. 32 Freemont Street Needham Massachusetts / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states PROTOTECH INC. 32 Freemont Street Needham, Massachusetts / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bar-Ilan, Amiram 147 Longwood Place Brookline, Massachusetts / US | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Rowland Allsop & Co., 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | ||
Former [1997/01] | Allsop, John Rowland Rowland Allsop & Co., 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96114594.3 | 17.05.1993 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | US19920885185 | 19.05.1992 Original published format: US 885185 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0751353 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0751353 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751353 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24C14/00, F24C15/20 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
F24C15/2014 (EP,US);
F24C14/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S55/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1997/01] | Title | German: | Filterschirm | [1997/01] | English: | Filter screen | [1997/01] | French: | Ecran-filtre | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93303788.9 / EP0571161 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.05.2000 | [2008/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1801668 (UNITED CARR INC) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS5922650 ; | [DA]US4113439 (OOKUBO TOSHIO, et al); | [A]EP0429994 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH03258346 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840518), vol. 008, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 223), & JP59022650 A 19840204 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920217), vol. 016, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 0910), & JP03258346 A 19911118 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |