EP0763374 - A ball game machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12 Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneko, Makoto c/o Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Jin, Yasuo c/o Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kataoka, Shingo c/o Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Akiyama, Takanori c/o Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114652.9 | 12.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | JP19950259267 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25926795 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763374 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763374 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63F5/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
A63F5/0005 (EP,US);
A63F2007/345 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2402 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2442 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2457 (EP,US);
A63F2009/2461 (EP,US);
A63F3/00157 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Kugelspielmaschine | [1997/12] | English: | A ball game machine | [1997/12] | French: | Dispositif de jeu à bille | [1998/21] |
Former [1997/12] | Dispositif de jeu à balle | Examination procedure | 12.09.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.03.1999 | NL | 10.03.1999 | PT | 12.09.1999 | [2008/29] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 10.03.1999 | |
NL | 10.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | NL | 10.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0529575U (SEGA) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5320351 (SUZUKI HISASHI [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column A; figures 1,6 *; | [A]GB2084830 (SANTORA FRANK, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4322080 (PENNINGTON HUGH) [A] 2,4,5 * figure 7 * |