EP0757466 - Mobile telephone terminal with power saving means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagami, Fujio KI Apart-206, 5-18-4, Tsunashima-nishi Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114726.1 | 19.05.1989 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880123006 | 21.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12300688 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0757466 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0757466 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757466 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72, H04Q7/32, H04Q7/18 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
H04W52/0293 (EP,US);
H04W52/0274 (EP,US);
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/06] | Title | German: | Mobilfunkendgerät mit Stromsparschaltung | [1997/06] | English: | Mobile telephone terminal with power saving means | [1997/06] | French: | Téléphone mobile avec dispositif d'économie d'énergie | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89109050.8 / EP0343528 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57196637 ; | [X]GB2061067 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,25 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 14; figure 1; claims 1,3,5 *; | [A]EP0103755 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 8; claims 1-3 * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 6 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 12 *; | [Y]EP0229692 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 27 - line 40 * * column 2, line 36 - line 43 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 17 - line 45 * * column 5, line 17 - line 27; figure 1; claims 1,9 *; | [Y]GB2187065 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 37 * * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 14; figure 1; claims 1,3,5 *; | [X] - YUKI, URABE AND KOBAYASHI, "Design considerations for mobile radio units used in high capacity land mobile communications system", REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES, TOKYO JP, (198703), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 109 - 114, XP000676170 [X] 1,25 * paragraph [2.1.2]; figures 1,3 * | [X] - RUSSELL OTT, "Eight bit CMOS microcomputer unit ideal for intelligent telephone systems", MINI MICRO CONFERENCE RECORD, NEW YORK US, pages 1 - 5, XP000676180 [X] 1,25 * page 1, line 54 - line 78 * * page 4, line 47 - line 68 * | [A] - PHILIP L. ROWE, "The MC68HC05C4: A CMOS processor with power to spare", MINI MICRO CONFERENCE RECORD, NEW YORK US, (198405), pages 1 - 8, XP000676181 [A] 1 * paragraph [0003] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830223), vol. 7, no. 45, Database accession no. (E - 160), & JP57196637 A 19821202 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |