EP0766277 - Insulated type switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanimizu, Tooru 27-11, Kuji-cho 6-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 02 /
Hayakawa, Masayoshi 2-73, Suwa-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Fumio 17-6, Oonuma-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Masato 1-1, Suwa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
Kajiwara, Satoru 4-1-5-1 Suwa-cho Hitachi, 316-0001 / JP | 06 /
Morita, Masatoshi 2-12-19 Kuji-cho Hitachi, 319-1222 / JP | 07 /
Morita, Ayumu 1-36-7-202 Nishinarusawa-cho Hitachi, 316-0032 / JP | [1999/02] |
Former [1997/14] | 01 /
Tanimizu, Tooru 27-11, Kuji-cho 6-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | ||
02 /
Hayakawa, Masayoshi 2-73, Suwa-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | |||
03 /
Shibata, Fumio 17-6, Oonuma-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Masato 1-1, Suwa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114837.6 | 16.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950249076 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24907695 | JP19950249078 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24907895 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766277 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0766277 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766277 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] |
Former [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0766277 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[1998/16] | |||
[1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/66 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
H01H33/022 (EP,US);
H01H33/08 (EP,US);
H01H33/664 (EP,US);
H01H33/6643 (EP,US);
H01H33/6645 (EP,US);
H01H33/666 (EP,US);
H02B1/01 (EP);
H01H31/003 (EP,US);
H01H33/027 (EP,US);
H01H33/6664 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/14] | Title | German: | Isolierte Schaltvorrichtung | [1997/14] | English: | Insulated type switching device | [1997/14] | French: | Dispositif de commutation isolé | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2060864 (INST PRUEFFELD ELEKT) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [YA]GB451963 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * page 4, line 43 - line 103 * * figures 5,5A * [A] 4; | [Y]GB1255383 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0011972 (SOUTH WALES SWITCHGEAR [GB]) [A] 4 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4103101 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4879441 (HAMM SIDNEY R [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 1, line 10 - line 36 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1,2 * |