EP0768222 - Hydraulic brake apparatus for preventing shortage of brake fluid in a master cylinder due to failure of a high pressure source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahata, Fumiaki c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114965.5 | 18.09.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950261810 | 09.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26181095 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768222 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768222 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/94, B60T17/18 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US);
B60T8/341 (EP,US);
B60T8/3655 (EP,US);
B60T8/4072 (EP,US);
B60T8/4827 (EP,US);
B60T8/94 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/16] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Bremsgerät zur Verhütung von Flüssigkeitsmangel in einem Hauptzylinder infolge Versagens einer Hochdruckquelle | [1997/16] | English: | Hydraulic brake apparatus for preventing shortage of brake fluid in a master cylinder due to failure of a high pressure source | [1997/16] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique de freinage pour empêcher une insuffisance de fluide de freinage dans un maître-cylindre en raison d'une défaillance d'une source de haute pression | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/19] | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2351488 (TELDIX GMBH) [Y] 1,6-10 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0503745 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4413980 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,6-10 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [D]JPH06312658 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [D] * the whole document *; | [A]US5372412 (YAGI EIJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 13 - line 54 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9514595 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph L * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 1 ** figure 1 * |