EP0831134 - Light- and bright-coloured antifouling paints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA COATINGS B.V. Amsterdamseweg, 14 1422 AD Uithoorn / NL | [1998/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramer, Johannes Petrus Lange Meer 19 3645 WV Vinkeveen / NL | 02 /
Vos, Marcel Hoofdweg 58 1275 AD Huizen / NL | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/13] | 01 /
Kramer, Johannes Petrus Lange Meer 19 3645 WV Vinkeveen / NL | ||
02 /
Vos, Marcel Akkerweg 6 1276 BC Huizen / NL | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [1998/13] | Leyder, Francis c/o Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C 7181 Feluy / BE | Application number, filing date | 96115024.0 | 19.09.1996 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0831134 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, A01N43/36 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
C09D5/1625 (EP,US);
C09D5/16 (KR);
A01N43/36 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | BE, DE, DK, FI, FR, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hellfarbige und hochglänzende bewuchsverhindernde Anstriche | [1998/13] | English: | Light- and bright-coloured antifouling paints | [1998/13] | French: | Peintures anti-salissures de couleur claire et brillante | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/31] | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.11.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0746979 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [E] 1,4,6,7 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, lines 33-58 * * page 3, lines 50-52 * * page 4, lines 27-36 *; | [A]EP0312723 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0372263 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0111452 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9603465 | GB1457590 | EP0289481 | EP0525441 | US5236493 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 514-10-3 |