EP0764450 - A backstop device for a syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/13] | A backstop device for a flangeless syringe | ||
[2001/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimard, Jean Pierre 14 Rue du Nord 38450 Vif / FR | 02 /
Olive, Eric 2, Rue David Girin 69002 Lyon / FR | [2002/33] |
Former [1997/13] | 01 /
Grimard, Jean-Pierre 14 Rue du Nord 38450 Vif / FR | ||
02 /
Olive, Eric 2, Rue David Girin 69002 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2001/09] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1997/13] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96115163.6 | 20.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | US19950532444 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: US 532444 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764450 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764450 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/315 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3139 (EP,US);
A61M5/31505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/13] | Title | German: | Eine Arretiervorrichtung für eine Spritze | [2001/41] | English: | A backstop device for a syringe | [2001/41] | French: | Un dispositif de butée pour une seringue | [2001/41] |
Former [1997/13] | Eine Arretiervorrichtung für eine Spritze ohne Flansch | ||
Former [1997/13] | A backstop device for a flangeless syringe | ||
Former [1997/13] | Un dispositif de butée pour une seringue sans collerette | Examination procedure | 14.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0528120 (VETTER & CO APOTHEKER [DE]) [A] 1-5,13,14,16-21 * column 5, line 39 - line 45; figures 1,6; claim 11 *; | [AD]WO9426334 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-5,13,14,16-21 * page 6, line 10 - line 18; figure - *; | [A]EP0242956 (INTELLIGENT MEDICINE INC [US]) [A] 1,13,16,17 * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]FR1232259 (CIBA GEIGY) [A] 6 * figure 4 *; | [A]US4291695 (BEKKERING HENDRIK M, et al) [A] 7,8 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US3967759 (BALDWIN BRIAN E, et al) [A] 9,10 * column 2, line 14 - line 19 * * column 11, line 8 - line 14 * * figures 5,8 *; | [AP]WO9535128 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1,13,14,16,17 * figure - * |