EP0772124 - Memory flow control for a computer controlling a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duschl, Dieter, Dr. Ahornstrasse 63 63071 Offenbach / DE | 02 /
Schlitz, Thomas Bornstrasse 12 63165 Mühlheim / DE | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/19] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung FTB/S, Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115254.3 | 24.09.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | DE1995139794 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19539794 | [1997/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772124 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772124 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
G11C29/74 (EP);
B41F33/0009 (EP);
G06F11/1612 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Speicherablaufsteuerung eines Rechners für den Leitstand einer Druckmaschine | [1997/19] | English: | Memory flow control for a computer controlling a printing machine | [1997/19] | French: | Commande à séquences des mémoires dans un ordinateur pour le contrôle d'une machine d'impression | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.12.2001 | NL | 12.12.2001 | SE | 12.03.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 12.12.2001 | |
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 12.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5155827 (GHERING BOYD W [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 23 *; | [A] - COHEN F B, "DEFENSE-IN-DEPTH AGAINST COMPUTER VIRUSES", COMPUTERS & SECURITY, OXFORD GB, (199210), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 563 - 579, XP000332272 [A] 1-3,5 * page 566, column L, line 34 - page 568, column L, line 17 * * page 570, column L, line 23 - line 41 * * page 570, column R, line 29 - page 571, column L, line 6 * * page 572, column R, line 5 - line 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(92)90192-T | [A] - "AUTOMATIC IPL DRIVE SWITCH", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940701), vol. 37, no. 7, page 5/6, XP000455419 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - MCKOSKY R A ET AL, "A FILE INTEGRITY CHECKING SYSTEM TO DETECT AND RECOVER FROM PROGRAM MODIFICATION ATTACKS IN MULTI-USER COMPUTER SYSTEMS", COMPUTERS & SECURITY, OXFORD GB, (199008), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 431 - 446, XP000147838 [A] 2-4 * page 436, column R, line 6 - page 437, column R, line 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(90)90074-4 |