EP0767181 - Hydrophilically modified powdered high or ultrahigh molecular weight polyethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Professor-Staudinger-Strasse 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Professor-Staudinger-strasse 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH An der B 43 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH An der B 43 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barth, Christiane Emmericher Strasse 116 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Ehlers, Jens, Dr. Krummer Weg 18 46499 Hamminkeln / DE | 03 /
Haftka, Stanislaw, Dr. Friedenshof 64 46485 Wesel / DE | [1997/15] | Application number, filing date | 96115339.2 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/15] | Priority number, date | DE1995136558 | 02.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19536558 | [1997/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0767181 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0767181 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767181 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08J9/224, C08J9/24 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (KR);
B01D39/1661 (EP,US);
B01D71/261 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/262 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/00 (KR);
C08J9/24 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C09D171/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008, C08L23/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C09D171/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [2000/52] |
Former [1997/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydrophil modifiziertes pulverförmiges hoch- und/oder ultrahochmolekulares Polyethylen | [1997/15] | English: | Hydrophilically modified powdered high or ultrahigh molecular weight polyethylene | [1997/15] | French: | Modification hydrophile de polyéthylène pulvérulent à poids moléculaire élevé ou ultra-élevé | [1997/15] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 08.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH476776 (PLAST LABOR SA [CH]); | [A]BE755075 (BASF AG); | [DA]US3853601 (TASKIER H); | [Y]GB1549949 (VNII SINTETISCHESKICH SMOL); | [A]EP0114503 (ROBOSERVE LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0335613 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0425886 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0565073 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]); | [Y]EP0594174 (HEIN FARBEN GMBH [DE]) |