EP0754882 - Mechanical-hydraulic transmission gear system and method of controlling power transmission using the system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanayama, Noboru, Tech. Ins. of K.K. Komatsu Seis. 1,200, Manda, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [1997/04] | 01 /
Kanayama, Noboru, #Tech. Ins. of K.K. Komatsu Seis. 1,200, Manda, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115593.4 | 31.05.1989 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880133765 | 31.05.1988 Original published format: JP 13376588 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0754882 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0754882 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H47/02, F16H61/46 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
F16H47/02 (EP);
F16H61/421 (EP);
F16H61/431 (EP);
F16H61/462 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | Mechanisch-hydraulisches Getriebesystem und Steuerverfahren für Leistungsgetriebe mit einem solchen System | [1997/04] | English: | Mechanical-hydraulic transmission gear system and method of controlling power transmission using the system | [1997/04] | French: | Système de transmission mécanique-hydraulique et procédé de commande d'une transmission de puissance utilisant un tel système | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89906463.8 / EP0417283 | Request for further processing for: | 29.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1078399 (DAIMLER-BENZ AG) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0234136 (SHIMADZU CORPORATION) [Y] 1-6 * column 5, line 1 - line 18 * * column 5, line 21 - line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3782225 (GRABOW, FRITZ) [A] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]DE2716960 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4306467 (POLLMAN, FREDERIC W.) [A] 1,5 * column W * |