Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
04.01.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
11.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
29.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
31.10.2001 | Renewal fee | |
26.10.2000 | Renewal fee | |
27.10.1999 | Renewal fee | |
13.11.1998 | Definitive list of designations | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
29.10.1998 | Renewal fee | |
27.02.1998 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] |
27.02.1998 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] |