EP0769443 - Connection of a steering wheel, especially of a motor vehicle steering wheel, to a steering column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/17] | Connection of a motor vehicle steering wheel to a steering column | ||
[1999/43] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/25] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heilig, Alexander Uhlandstrasse 17 73550 Wissgoldingen / DE | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115940.7 | 04.10.1996 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | DE1995216622U | 20.10.1995 Original published format: DE 29516622 U | [1997/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0769443 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0769443 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/10 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
B62D1/10 (EP,KR,US);
F16D1/06 (KR);
F16D1/0852 (EP,US);
B60Y2410/102 (KR);
Y10S403/08 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Lenkrades, insbesondere eines Fahrzeuglenkrades, an einer Lenkwelle | [1999/50] | English: | Connection of a steering wheel, especially of a motor vehicle steering wheel, to a steering column | [1999/50] | French: | Fixation entre un volant de direction, notamment le volant de direction d'un véhicule automobile, et une colonne de direction | [1999/50] |
Former [1997/17] | Befestigung eines Fahrzeuglenkrades an einer Lenkwelle | ||
Former [1997/17] | Connection of a motor vehicle steering wheel to a steering column | ||
Former [1997/17] | Fixation entre le volant de direction d'un véhicule automobile et la colonne de direction | Examination procedure | 22.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/40] | 05.05.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1015704 (PETRI LENKRADWERK) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0501149 (WALTERSCHEID GMBH JEAN [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * |