EP0768647 - Optical disk and optical disk reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takemura, Yoshinari 2-8-11, Befu Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
Ohara, Shunji 221-5, Shinjou Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 578 / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Takashi 13-14, Hashimoto Isoku Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614 / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Yoshito Shoun-Ryo No. 203, 2-26-3, Yagumokitamachi Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | 05 /
Furumiya, Shigeru 1-11-22-2, Tsujii Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670 / JP | 06 /
Gushima, Toyoji 3-5-10, Takawashi Habikino-shi, Osaka 583 / JP | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116062.9 | 08.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950261244 | 09.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26124495 | JP19960023565 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2356596 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768647 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768647 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
G11B7/00745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/16] | Title | German: | Optische Platte und optisches Plattenwiedergabegerät | [1997/16] | English: | Optical disk and optical disk reproduction apparatus | [1997/16] | French: | Disque optique et appareil de reproduction de disque optique | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 26.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0469727 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 39; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE4114234 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 3 - line 41 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0265849 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 30 - column 7, line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS615488 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860603), vol. 010, no. 152, Database accession no. (P - 462), & JP61005488 A 19860111 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |