EP0768540 - Transponder system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Haggertystrasse 1 85356 Freising / DE | [1997/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuermann, Josef H. An der Muehle 6 8051 Oberhummel / DE | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116150.2 | 09.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | US19950005094 | 11.10.1995 Original published format: US 5094 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768540 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/02 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
G01S13/758 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP);
G06K7/10297 (EP);
G01S13/825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/16] | Title | German: | Transponderverfahren und -system | [1997/16] | English: | Transponder system and method | [1997/16] | French: | Système et méthode de transpondeurs | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/15] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9520797 (ALLFLEX SA [FR]) [Y] 1,8,14 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 23; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5451958 (J. SCHUERMANN) [Y] 1,8,14 * column 1, line 9 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [AP]US5517194 (G. T. CARROLL ET AL) [AP] * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 32; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0638819 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0473569 (MIKRON GESELLSCHAFT FÜR INTEGRIERTE MIKROELEKTRONIK) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO8905549 (MAGELLAN CORP.) [A] * figure 1; claim 20 *; | [A]EP0404148 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [A] * abstract * |