EP0768058 - Improved machine for household cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.P.A. IMPEX S.p.A. Piazzetta Albere, 3/4 I-36060 Romano d'Ezzelino Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states T.P.A. IMPEX S.p.A. Piazzetta Albere, 3/4 I-36060 Romano d'Ezzelino, Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amoretti, Andrea Via Benacchio, 17 36060 Romano d'Ezzelino, (P. of Vicenza) / IT | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96116245.0 | 10.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | IT1995PD00189 | 13.10.1995 Original published format: IT PD950189 | IT1996PD00178 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: IT PD960178 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768058 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768058 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768058 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/18 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
A47L9/181 (EP,US);
A47L9/183 (EP,US);
Y10S55/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/16] | Title | German: | Haushaltsreinigungsmaschine | [1997/16] | English: | Improved machine for household cleaning | [1997/16] | French: | Machine pour le nettoyage domestique | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2530195 (ANTONINO GIACOBELLO) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4251241 (BOTHUN EUGENE L) [A] 1,4,5,9 * column 2, lines 26-44 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 68; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9510972 (SJOEGREEN JOERGEN [DK]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 20 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-5B * |