EP0841300 - A process and a device for headspace foaming of containers filled with carbonated beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Babel, Olaf, Dipl.-Ing. Freiheit 5 45527 Hattingen / DE | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard, et al advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Böck, Bernhard, et al Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Böck, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Böck + Tappe Kollegen, Egloffsteinstrasse 7 97072 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116250.0 | 10.10.1996 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841300 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/22 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B67C3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Schaumbildung im Kopfteil von mit kohlensäurehaltigen Getränken gefüllten Behältern | [1998/20] | English: | A process and a device for headspace foaming of containers filled with carbonated beverages | [1998/20] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour faire mousser le liquide du goulot des bouteilles remplies avec des boissons gazeuses | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3088831 (FAUTH FREDERICK E, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 13 - line 15 * * column 3, line 56 - line 59; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9614943 (M & A PACKAGING SERV LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,7 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0723928 (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 17 - line 23 *; | [A]DE1121955 (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 21 - line 25 *; | [DA]DE9116815U (ORTHMANN & HERBST [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph 1 * |