EP0774841 - Circuit for a mobile braodcast receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Steffen Eduard-Spranger-Str. 38 80935 München / DE | [1997/21] | Application number, filing date | 96116293.0 | 11.10.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | DE1995142737 | 16.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19542737 | [1997/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0774841 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0774841 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774841 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H04B1/10 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
H04B1/1081 (EP,US);
H04B1/1669 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/21] | Title | German: | Schaltanordnung für mobile Rundfunkempfänger | [1997/21] | English: | Circuit for a mobile braodcast receiver | [1997/21] | French: | Circuit d'un récepteur de radiodiffusion mobile | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4087641 (SUGAI YOSHIRO) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE4014394 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US5369470 (HANSEN JENS [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |