EP0770638 - Polyimide compositions for electrodeposition and coatings formed of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itatani, Hiroshi 2-1-25-202, Minatoshinden, Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1999/18] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states PI MATERIALS RESEARCH LABORATORY 3-13-10, Tamachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states PI MATERIAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 13-10, Tamachi 3-chome, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oie, Yoshihiro 1-1-8, Honamanuma, Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Itatani, Hiroshi 2-1-25-202, Minatoshinden Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Furusaki, Shinichi 1-12-7-307, Asahi-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Hokamura, Sadakazu 1-10-7, Soyagi Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Yamazaki, Yuji 1920-1, Usuba Ohtawara-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1999/22] |
Former [1997/18] | 01 /
Oie, Yoshihiro 1-1-8, Honamanuma, Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Itatani, Hiroshi 2-1-25-202, Minatoshinden Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Furusaki, Shinichi 1-12-7-307, Asahi-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Hokamura, Sadakazu 1-10-7, Soyagi Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Yamazaki, Yujikazu 1920-1, Usuba Ohtawara-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116449.8 | 14.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | JP19950264353 | 12.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26435395 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770638 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770638 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, C09D179/00, H01B3/30 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
H01B3/306 (EP,US);
C09D179/08 (EP,US);
C09D5/4461 (EP,US);
Y10S524/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | Polyimidzusammensetzungen für die Elektroabscheidungsbeschichtung sowie daraus hergestellte Beschichtungen | [1998/52] | English: | Polyimide compositions for electrodeposition and coatings formed of the same | [1997/18] | French: | Compositions de polyimide pour le dépot életrolytique et revêtement réalisés à partir de celles-ci | [1997/18] |
Former [1997/18] | Polyimidezusammensetzungen für die Elektroabscheidungbeschichtung sowie daraus hergestellte Beschichtungen | Examination procedure | 20.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1354532 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1,14,15 * page 1, line 28 - page 9, line 6; example - *; | [A]FR2292749 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14,15* the whole document *; | [Y]US4257861 (LUPINSKI JOHN H, et al) [Y] 1,3,5-10,14,15 * column 1, line 45 - column 5, line 49; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2113233 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,14,15 * page 1, lines 40-55 *; | [XY]EP0604319 (PI MATERIAL RESEARCH LAB [JP]) [X] 11 * page 5, lines 22-56; example 10; claim - * * page 6, lines 31-35; example 10 * [Y] 1,3,5-10,14,15 |