EP0769726 - Process for projection exposure of a workpiece with alignment marks on the rear side and device for executing the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoneta 2-23-4, Nishi, Utsukushigaoka, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/17] | Weber, Otto-Ernst, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116765.7 | 18.10.1996 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | JP19950272374 | 20.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27237495 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0769726 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0769726 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0769726 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
G03F9/70 (EP,US);
G03F9/7084 (KR);
G03F9/00 (EP,US);
G03F9/7046 (KR);
G03F9/7088 (KR);
H01L23/544 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Projektionsbelichtung eines mit rückseitigen Ausrichtmarken versehenen Werkstücks und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1997/17] | English: | Process for projection exposure of a workpiece with alignment marks on the rear side and device for executing the process | [1997/17] | French: | Procédé d'exposition par projection d'une pièce à traiter avec repères d'alignement sur la face arrière et dispositif de mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1997/17] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.07.2002 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05144702 ; | [A]JPH01164032 ; | [A]JPH03246923 ; | [A]JPS6083329 ; | [Y]US3709579 (MAKOSCH G) [Y] 11 * abstract *; | [Y]US3950094 (KANO ICHIRO, et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph L *; | [X]US4798470 (MORIYAMA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 53 * * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 34 * * figures 2,3,8 *; | [XY]US4952060 (INA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 26 * * figure - * [Y] 2,5,8,11; | [Y]EP0556669 (SUESS KG KARL [DE]) [Y] 2,5,8,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930921), vol. 017, no. 525, Database accession no. (E - 1436), & JP05144702 A 19930611 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890928), vol. 013, no. 435, Database accession no. (E - 825), & JP01164032 A 19890628 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,8,11,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920130), vol. 016, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 1161), & JP03246923 A 19911105 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2,5,8,11,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850911), vol. 009, no. 225, Database accession no. (E - 342), & JP60083329 A 19850511 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 11 * abstract * |