EP0778633 - Chip antenna having dielectric and magnetic material portions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanba, Seiji Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Tsuru, Teruhisa Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Asakura, Kenji Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Suesada, Tsuyoshi Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 05 /
Mandai, Harufumi Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, P.O. Box 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116878.8 | 21.10.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | JP19950320254 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: JP 32025495 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778633 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778633 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/38 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/24] | Title | German: | Chip-Antenne mit dielektrischen und magnetischen Materialteilen | [1997/24] | English: | Chip antenna having dielectric and magnetic material portions | [1997/24] | French: | Antenne monopuce à portions de matériau diélectrique et magnétique | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0759646 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [E] 1,17-29 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0554486 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-17; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP0630068 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 40 - page 8, line 47; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2013037 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4012738 (WRIGHT RUFUS W) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-4 * |