18.02.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
27.02.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.09.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.07.2003 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] |
04.07.2003 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] |
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
25.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.01.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
11.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.12.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
30.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.10.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
04.09.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
05.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.02.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
18.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.02.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] |
21.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.01.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
09.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.01.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
04.12.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
22.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.01.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
25.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.12.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
21.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.11.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
13.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
04.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.12.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
22.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
13.11.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
09.11.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.06.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
09.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |