blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0780206

EP0780206 - Process for making foamed particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/26]Process for making foamable granulate
[2003/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fagerdala Deutschland GmbH
Herrenhöfer Landstrasse 6
99885 Ohrdruf / DE
[2002/12]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Gefinex Polymerschäume GmbH
Rote Erde 6
33803 Steinhagen / DE
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Träger, Michael, Dr.
Herderstrasse 18 a
45721 Haltern / DE
02 / Wirobski, Reinhard
Hammkamp 1
45768 Marl / DE
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Kaewert, Klaus
Rechtsanwalt Gänsestrasse 4
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Kaewert, Klaus
Rechtsanwalt, Gänsestrasse 4
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96117040.424.10.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateDE199514739819.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19547398
[1997/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0780206
Date:25.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0780206
Date:22.07.1998
[1998/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780206
Date:14.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1998
ClassificationIPC:B29B9/10, B29C44/02, C08J9/16, C08L23/16
[1997/26]
CPC:
B29B9/065 (EP); B29B7/88 (EP); B29B9/12 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP); B29C44/3461 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [2003/34]
Former [1997/26]AT,  BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Partikelschaum[2003/34]
English:Process for making foamed particles[2003/34]
French:Procédé de fabrication de particules de mousse[2003/34]
Former [1997/26]Verfahren zur Herstellung schäumbarer Kunststoff-Granulate
Former [1997/26]Process for making foamable granulate
Former [1997/26]Procédé de fabrication de granules de résine moussable
Examination procedure02.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/10]
13.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2003Fee for grant paid
30.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Request for further processing for:30.09.2002Request for further processing filed
11.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.11.2002Decision despatched
11.12.2001Request for further processing filed
13.12.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
06.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199904   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2000
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2000
31.10.200106   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2002
31.10.200207   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2002
31.10.200308   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4606873  (BIGLIONE GIANFRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 34; figure 1; example 3; claim 1 * [Y] 6-9;
 [X]US5234963  (GARCIA RODRIGO A [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * figure 1; example 10; claim 1 *;
 [DY]EP0564781  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DY] 6-9 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP0673963  (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 6-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0668139  (SULZER CHEMTECH AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - line 37 *;
 [A]EP0305862  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE1915950  (BASF AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4385016  (GWINN J S) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph L; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [DA]JPS5253965  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0805009
by applicantEP0053333
 EP0095109
 EP0195118
 EP0359032
 DE2626968
 JPH06115413
 JPS5437191B
 DE2626970
 JPS5253965
 EP0113903
 EP0168954
 EP0630935
 EP0646619
 EP0564781
 EP0673963
 DE2542452
 EP0072499
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.