EP0773226 - Propiophenone derivative and processes for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsujihara, Kenji No. 1149-133, Oaza-Omaki Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Saito, Kunio 208 Casa Grande Omiya No. 225, Dote-cho 3-chome Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hongu, Mitsuya 301 White City, No. 11-10 Naka-cho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Mamoru No. 3-35, Ayameikeminami 3-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Oka, Kozo 307 Doeru Shugakuin No.12,Yamabanomorimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1997/33] |
Former [1997/20] | 01 /
Tsujihara, Kenji No. 1149-133, Oaza-Omaki Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117088.3 | 24.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | JP19950288487 | 07.11.1995 Original published format: JP 28848795 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773226 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773226 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/26, C07H15/203, A61K31/70 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
C07H15/203 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H15/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Propiophenon-Derivate und Verfahren zur ihrer Herstellung | [1997/20] | English: | Propiophenone derivative and processes for preparing the same | [1997/20] | French: | Dérivés de propiophénone et procédés pour leur préparation | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 25.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4760135 (DIEDRICH DONALD F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0598359 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0684254 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4,6-8* the whole document *; | [DA] - L.ROSSETTI ET AL., "Correction of Hyperglycemia with Phlorizin Normalizes Tissue Sensitivity to Insulin in Diabetic Rats.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1987), vol. 79, pages 1510 - 1515, XP000617166 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI112981 | [DA] - L.ROSSETTI ET AL., "Glucose Toxicity", DIABETES CARE, (1990), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 610 - 630, XP000617222 [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | - DIABETOLOGIA, (1985), vol. 28, page 119 | - DIABETES CARE, (1990), vol. 13, page 610 |