blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0771959

EP0771959 - Coupling between hub and shaft with at least one key [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.1998
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.1998Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.1998 [1998/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Truninger AG
Industriestrasse 9
4513 Langendorf/Solothurn / CH
[1997/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Truninger, Rolf, Dr. Ing.
Industriestr. 9
4513 Langendorf/Solothurn / CH
[1997/19]
Representative(s)Haug, Dietmar, et al
Andrae Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/19]Haug, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Kneissl Bauer Schneider, Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date96117089.124.10.1996
[1997/19]
Priority number, dateDE199514043230.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19540432
[1997/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0771959
Date:07.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:F16D1/08, F16B3/00
[1997/19]
CPC:
F16D1/0876 (EP); F16B3/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1997/19]
TitleGerman:Wellen-Nabenverbindung mit mindestens einem Formschlusselement[1997/19]
English:Coupling between hub and shaft with at least one key[1997/19]
French:Accouplement entre arbre et moyeu avec au moins un clef[1997/19]
Examination procedure08.11.1997Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1998/36]
23.03.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1998/36]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2623765  (ALEXANDER COQUILLE) [X] 1-7,9,10,12 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 44; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]DE390210  (CLEMENS FRHR V BECHTOLSHEIM, et al) [X] 1-7,10,12 * page 1, line 32 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR357967  (CLEMENT DE BECHTOLSHEIM [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 2; figures 8-10 *;
 [X]FR567959  (CIE FORGES ET ACIERIES MARINE) [X] 1,2,4-8,12 * page 1, line 52 - page 2, line 7; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE3006645  (FLEKAC FRANTISEK) [X] 1,2,6-12 * page 9, paragraph 10 - page 12, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US2332270  (SHAW CLARENCE W) [X] 1,2,6-9 * page 1, column R, line 43 - page 2, column L, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE4230712  (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,13 * column 2, line 14 - line 62; figure 1 *;
 [X]CH274958  (ETERNOD EDGAR D [CH]) [X] 1,2,6-9,14 * page 1, line 54 - page 2, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0293582  (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE]) [X] 14 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 30; figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.