EP0795739 - Tank indicator and method for determining the residual volume in a tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 60326 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 60326 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallrafen, Werner Cimbernstrasse 2 65719 Hofheim / DE | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [1997/38] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117225.1 | 26.10.1996 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | DE1996110154 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19610154 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795739 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795739 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00, G01F9/00, B60K15/06 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
B60K15/06 (EP,US);
G01F23/808 (EP,US);
B60K15/061 (EP,US);
B60K15/077 (EP,US);
G01F23/36 (EP,US);
G01F23/804 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/38] | G01F23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/38] | Title | German: | Tankanzeige und Verfahren zur Ermittlung des Restvolumens in einem Tank | [1997/38] | English: | Tank indicator and method for determining the residual volume in a tank | [1997/38] | French: | Indicateur pour réservoir et méthode de détermination du volume résiduel dans un réservoir | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 01.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2531847 (HALEY DOUGLAS C) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8,11-15 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 19 - line 22 * * column 2, line 31 - line 37 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 4 *; | [Y]US3714823 (WILKENS H, et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8,11-15 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 50 - line 61 * * column 3, line 32 - line 63 * * column 4, line 40 - line 62 *; | [Y]DE3521615 (SCHIEMANN DR WOLFRAM [DE]) [Y] 1,3,7,8,14,15 * figure 1 * * page 12, line 10 - line 16 * * page 16, line 25 - page 17, line 2 *; | [Y]US4306579 (KELLY MICHAEL J) [Y] 1,3,7,8,14,15 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 8 - line 11 * * column 1, line 35 - line 36 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 20 * * column 5, line 8 - line 13 * * column 5, line 61 - line 68 *; | [A]DE3225351 (SCHIEMANN DR WOLFRAM) [A] 1,7,8,15 * figure 1; claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]DE4342594 (FORD WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 2,4,10,16 * abstract * * page 2, line 62 - page 3, line 15 *; | [A]DE3224919 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 6,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE3326719 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 17 * abstract * |