EP0773180 - Method and device for increasing safety of elevators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 175 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spiess, Peter, Dipl. El.-Ing. ETH Meggenhornstrasse 15 6045 Meggen / CH | [1997/20] | Application number, filing date | 96117251.7 | 28.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | CH19950003158 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: CH 315895 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773180 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773180 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/04 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B66B5/04 (EP,US);
B66B5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur erhöhten Sicherheit bei Aufzügen | [1997/20] | English: | Method and device for increasing safety of elevators | [1997/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour augmenter la sécurité des ascenseurs | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0498597 (POON OTTO L [HK]) [DA] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE2128662 | EP0110095 | DE3818083 | US4887695 | US5366045 |