EP0771584 - Heat-resistant catalyst support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Takeru c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Murachi, Mikio c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Tsuji, Shinji c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1997/19] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117339.0 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | JP19950282996 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28299695 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771584 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771584 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/04 (KR);
B01J23/10 (EP,US);
B01D2255/91 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Hitzebeständiger Katalysatorträger | [1997/19] | English: | Heat-resistant catalyst support | [1997/19] | French: | Support résistant à la chaleur pour catalyseurs | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3913972 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11* claims 1-12 *; | [X]EP0485180 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 11 *; | [X]EP0507590 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 36; example -; claims 1-13 *; | [X]EP0613714 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 42 - line 44 * * page 6, line 21 - line 52; claims 8,16; table 7 *; | [X]EP0657204 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11 * page 23, line 53 - line 57; examples 19-33; claims 1-30; tables 4,6 *; | [PX]EP0718028 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-11 * page 3, line 55 - page 6, line 19; example 9; claims 1-9 * | by applicant | JPH05168860 | JPH05317652 | JPH0631139 |