EP0776713 - A method for laminate forming a sand mould and a method for producing a casting using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoh, Hiromoto c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 02 /
Otsuka, Yukio c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 03 /
Ozaki, Motoaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Masuo c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 05 /
Okada, Yuji c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 06 /
Senda, Yoshizumi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 07 /
Takagi, Soya c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | 08 /
Ogura, Masaru c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-71 / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117352.3 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950290932 | 09.11.1995 Original published format: JP 29093295 | JP19950330471 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33047195 | JP19960123787 | 17.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12378796 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0776713 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0776713 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776713 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/00, B23K26/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B22C9/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/00 (KR);
B22C1/22 (KR);
B23K26/00 (KR);
B29C33/3807 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Form aus Schichten und damit hergestelltes Gussstück | [1997/23] | English: | A method for laminate forming a sand mould and a method for producing a casting using the same | [1997/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de moules stratifiés et pièce coulée | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98124848.7 / EP0906801 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2001/06] | FR | 28.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4247508 (HOUSHOLDER ROSS F) [X] 1,4,21,22 * column 7, line 42 - line 50 * * column 8, line 28 - line 46 * [Y] 8; | [A]WO9216822 (XAAR LTD [GB]) [A] 3,13-20* abstract *; | [Y]US5354414 (FEYGIN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 3,8 * column 26, line 28 - column 27, line 53; figure 43 *; | [PYA]US5504301 (EVELAND JAMES A [US]) [PY] 3 * claim 1 * [A] 13-20 | by applicant | US4247508 |