EP0772097 - Electrophotographic developing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 5-22, Kitainoue-cho, Higashino, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 5-22, Kitainoue-cho, Higashino, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Susumu, c/o Kyocera Corp. Yohga Office, 2-14-9, Tamagawadai Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158 / JP | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117436.4 | 30.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | JP19950306951 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: JP 30695195 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772097 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0772097 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772097 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
G03G15/0808 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0607 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/19] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Entwicklungsgerät | [1997/19] | English: | Electrophotographic developing apparatus | [1997/19] | French: | Appareil de développement électrophotographique | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04013282.1 / EP1475673 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5095850 (KOMURO ICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,16 * column W *; | [YA]US5324884 (HONDA TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,7,16 * column W * [A] 3,4,10-15; | [A]JPS61105574 ; | [A]JPH06295123 ; | [X]US4508052 (KOHYAMA MITSUAKI [JP]) [X] 17 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 53; figures 2-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860930), vol. 010, no. 288, Database accession no. (P - 502), & JP61105574 A 19860523 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-6,10-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06295123 A 19941021 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-6,10-16 * abstract * | by applicant | US4281329 | US4292387 | US4395476 |