EP0771662 - Ink absorbing body, ink tank, ink-jet cartridge and ink-jet printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hajime Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Eiichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsuo, Keisuke Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Arashima, Teruo Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Hinami, Jun Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Takahashi, Wataru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/19] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117529.6 | 31.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | JP19950286231 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: JP 28623195 | JP19960280879 | 23.10.1996 Original published format: JP 28087996 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0771662 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0771662 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771662 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, C09D11/00 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/19] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/19] | Title | German: | Tintenabsorbierender Körper, Tintenbehälter, Tintenkartusche und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | [1997/19] | English: | Ink absorbing body, ink tank, ink-jet cartridge and ink-jet printing apparatus | [1997/19] | French: | Elément d'absorption d'encre, réservoir d'encre, cartouche d'encre et appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.02.2003 | [2003/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2190111 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [A] 1-25 * page 1, line 40 - line 46 *; | [A]GB2268911 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 94, line 26 - page 96, line 1 *; | [A]EP0619349 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-25 * page 3, line 55 - line 56 *; | [A]EP0640484 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-25 * page 14, line 44 - line 58 *; | [PA]EP0704303 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-25* page 8, line 14 - line 16 * |