EP0779094 - Spinel based catalyst, its preparation and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartweg, Martin, Dr. Im Wall 5 89153 Erbach / DE | 02 /
Seibold, Andrea Hülenweg 16 89134 Blaustein / DE | 03 /
Walz, Leonhard, Dr. Rheinauer Ring 37 76437 Rastatt / DE | 04 /
Fetzer, Thomas, Dr. Wormser Landstrasse 144 67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
Morsbach, Bernd Utestrasse 22 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1997/25] | Application number, filing date | 96117578.3 | 02.11.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | DE1995146476 | 13.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546476 | [1997/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0779094 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0779094 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/00 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/8628 (EP,US);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01D2251/208 (EP,US);
B01D2255/102 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/25] | Title | German: | Spinellkatalysator und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Verwendung desselben | [1997/25] | English: | Spinel based catalyst, its preparation and its use | [1997/25] | French: | Catalyseur à base de spinelle, sa préparation et son application | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.02.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP00128400.9 / EP1097743 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0210681 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-17; table 2 * [Y] 6,7; | [X]JPH0751569 ; | [Y]US4274981 (SUZUKI YOSHIHIRO, et al) [Y] 6 * claims 1-7; table 1 *; | [Y]EP0676232 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 26; claims 2-12 *; | [A]DE4142900 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4224881 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 4 * claims 1-21 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 17, Database accession no. 95-127499, XP002028012 & JPH0751569 A 19950228 (TOSOH CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4301470 |